HUXLEY TRUST

Charity number: 1126431
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 01/01/2016 01/01/2017 01/01/2018 01/01/2019 01/01/2020
Total gross income £7.00k £10.35k £10.47k £8.03k £5.00k
Total expenditure £8.31k £10.34k £10.47k £8.03k £5.00k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A