ZEST-HEALTH FOR LIFE LIMITED

Charity number: 1125805
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £524.53k £429.10k £497.92k £507.72k £560.35k
Total expenditure £566.23k £448.51k £565.78k £499.37k £511.08k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £197.99k £97.24k £259.24k
Income from government grants £355.82k £353.02k £13.68k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.67k N/A N/A £8.12k £12.35k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £521.52k N/A N/A £499.32k £547.69k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment £338 N/A N/A £282 £314
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £566.23k N/A N/A £499.37k £511.08k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £4.52k N/A N/A £8.49k £7.54k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A £0 £0