ZEST-HEALTH FOR LIFE LIMITED

Charity number: 1125805
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gemma Islip Trustee 08 July 2021 None on record
Canon ANN DOROTHEA NICHOLL Trustee
LEEDS CHURCH INSTITUTE (INCORPORATED) Received: On time
THE MARKET PLACE (LEEDS) Received: On time
BURMANTOFTS COMMUNITY PROJECTS Received: On time
Scott Robson Trustee 13 May 2020 None on record
Barbara Rhodes Trustee 06 January 2014 None on record
Tracey Akamaguna Trustee 18 June 2021 None on record
Dan Barnett Chair 01 August 2016 None on record