Torquay United Community Sports Trust

Charity number: 1125138
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 12 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 12 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 17 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 17 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 21 December 2019 235 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 21 December 2019 235 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 27 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

27 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 12 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

28 February 2017 On time Download