Torquay United Community Sports Trust

Charity number: 1125138
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £169.39k £245.03k £245.84k £183.89k £178.21k
Total expenditure £180.68k £216.70k £272.98k £196.52k £171.72k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A