BHAI LALO GURMAT PARCHAR SOCIETY

Charity number: 1125985
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £28.99k £16.02k £14.23k £11.37k £11.61k
Total expenditure £26.90k £13.00k £17.23k £11.56k £13.57k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A