Financial history THE ROYAL ACADEMY OF ARTS

Charity number: 1125383
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £49.72m £48.84m £44.87m £45.32m £36.73m
Total expenditure £39.38m £42.20m £41.91m £37.78m £30.81m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £28.34m £27.25m £24.09m £27.96m £26.41m
Income - Other trading activities £14.03m £13.45m £13.68m £12.30m £7.07m
Income - Charitable activities £7.14m £8.12m £7.08m £5.04m £3.25m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £286.33k £625.00k £0
Income - Investment £199.34k £18.72k £21.75k £18.61k £470
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £1.38m £41.17k £0 £583.97k £842.12k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £21.65m £28.96m £29.46m £27.17m £21.80m
Expenditure - Raising funds £16.12m £12.05m £12.38m £10.60m £8.27m
Expenditure - Governance £88.69k £69.82k £0 £81.65k £71.68k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £5.89k
Expenditure - Other £1.60m £1.18m £62.74k £16.83k £735.85k