Trustees THE ROYAL ACADEMY OF ARTS

Charity number: 1125383
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Richard Deacon CBE RA Trustee 05 October 2021
NATIONAL ART COLLECTIONS FUND
Received: On time
Professor Alison Wilding OBE RA Trustee 05 October 2021
ENGLISH CATHEDRALS FUND
Received: On time
THE BRYAN ROBERTSON TRUST
Received: 45 days late
Isaac Julien CBE RA Trustee 05 October 2021
QUEERCIRCLE
Recently registered
Professor Sonia Boyce OBE RA Trustee 05 October 2021
None on record
Emma Stibbon RA Trustee 05 October 2021
None on record
Louisa Hutton OBE RA Trustee 05 October 2021
None on record
Stephen Chambers Trustee 06 October 2020
None on record
Lubaina Himid RA Trustee 06 October 2020
None on record
Jock McFadyen RA Trustee 06 October 2020
None on record
Rebecca Salter PRA Trustee 10 December 2019
Royal Academy Trust
Received: On time
THE CHANTREY BEQUEST
Received: On time
Grayson Perry CBE Trustee 01 October 2019
THE FOUNDLING MUSEUM
Received: On time
THE BRITISH MUSEUM FRIENDS
Received: On time
Tony Baumgartner Trustee 01 October 2019
None on record
Eva Rothschild RA Trustee 01 October 2019
None on record
SIMON FRIEND Trustee 09 October 2018
JEWISH CARE
Received: On time
GARY HUME RA Trustee 09 October 2018
None on record
Helen Boaden Trustee 01 November 2016
THE RICHARD DIMBLEBY CANCER FUND
Received: On time
OUT OF JOINT
Received: On time
THE WINDSOR LEADERSHIP TRUST
Received: On time