Financial history COLCHESTER KORBAN PROJECT

Charity number: 1125617
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £41.77k £72.30k £63.65k £88.08k £125.70k
Total expenditure £43.35k £69.15k £65.16k £71.73k £89.24k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £20.00k N/A N/A £500