Accounts and annual returns SAFAR ACADEMY TRUST

Charity number: 1125653
Charity reporting is overdue by 14 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Overdue by 14 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Overdue by 14 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 18 December 2023 171 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 18 December 2023 171 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 28 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 28 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 28 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window