BANGLADESH WELFARE ASSOCIATON & COMMUNITY CENTRE BOLTON

Charity number: 1125754
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £950 £1.25k £150 £3.15k £7.89k
Total expenditure £1.18k £1.47k £195 £4.60k £8.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A