Financial history IN CONTROL PARTNERSHIPS

Charity number: 1130761
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £487.77k £306.73k £460.23k £433.23k £623.12k
Total expenditure £485.08k £399.38k £372.55k £457.38k £604.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £214.96k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £28.02k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £594.64k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £460
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £604.23k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £21.99k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0