AMAZON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1127628
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £64.97k £63.38k £93.03k £104.97k £47.72k
Total expenditure £87.16k £65.06k £70.61k £100.39k £56.73k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A