Financial history ASPIRE SPORTS AND CULTURAL TRUST

Charity number: 1125995
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £3.62m £3.27m £2.95m £2.84m £1.19m
Total expenditure £3.62m £3.33m £3.32m £3.82m £1.55m
Income from government contracts £457.51k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £257.51k N/A N/A £801.87k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £194.68k £55.53k £46.29k £49.69k £262.84k
Income - Charitable activities £3.42m £3.21m £2.90m £2.78m £382.98k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.62k £4.25k £4.37k £4.07k £256
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £546.31k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.47m £3.27m £3.28m £3.80m £1.54m
Expenditure - Raising funds £124.49k £44.67k £37.16k £20.83k £3.45k
Expenditure - Governance £22.82k £23.69k £58.64k £33.81k £15.60k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £22.82k £23.69k £0 £0 £0