Trustees THE BRITISH SOCIETY OF AESTHETICS
Charity number: 1129985
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr STACIE FRIEND | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr Hans Maes | Trustee | 16 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mark Windsor | Trustee | 10 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Dawn Wilson | Trustee | 10 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Daisy Dixon | Trustee | 10 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Clare Mac Cumhaill | Trustee | 10 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Karen Simecek | Trustee | 11 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lee Walters | Trustee | 11 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Dr Adriana Clavel-Vazquez | Trustee | 18 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Maarten Steenhagen | Trustee | 07 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr ANDREW HUDDLESTON | Trustee | 22 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Panagiotis Paris | Trustee | 22 September 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.