CHARVILLE PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1125902
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £5.56k £6.34k £8.31k £16.36k £5.92k
Total expenditure £7.54k £6.79k £10.31k £14.58k £9.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A