Financial history MILTON KEYNES YMCA LIMITED

Charity number: 1125743
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.50m £10.84m £1.37m £2.73m £3.07m
Total expenditure £1.45m £1.27m £1.49m £2.87m £3.24m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £90.00k N/A £1.07m £88.00k £262.44k
Income - Donations and legacies £115.90k £137.00k £88.10k £24.52k £633.81k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £19.75k £62.37k £80.57k
Income - Charitable activities £1.22m £1.30m £1.24m £2.58m £2.21m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £150.12k £19.00k £17.89k £13.81k £134.50k
Income - Other £17.44k £9.39m £0 £51.20k £8.11k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.37m £1.24m £1.36m £2.70m £3.22m
Expenditure - Raising funds £85.38k £34.00k £133.25k £168.51k £18.81k
Expenditure - Governance £12.82k £0 £18.53k £17.60k £15.80k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £8.77k £0 £12.49k £86.88k £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0