HEALTHCARE QUALITY IMPROVEMENT PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1127049
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £24.48m £24.44m £20.11m £21.09m £17.22m
Total expenditure £20.48m £20.41m £21.35m £21.88m £20.79m
Income from government contracts £24.46m £24.31m £20.08m £20.96m £16.98m
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £24.46m £24.31m £20.08m £21.03m £17.16m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £5.95k £30.76k £24.85k £52.21k £56.22k
Income - Other £10.00k £90.79k £7.47k £11.80k £9.79k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £20.48m £20.41m £21.35m £21.88m £20.79m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £24.64k £16.91k £17.45k £31.45k £29.66k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0