BELIEVERS FELLOWSHIP AND PRAYER MINISTRY

Charity number: 1126684
Charity reporting is up to date (17 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £45.39k £40.98k £85.13k £78.02k £69.42k
Total expenditure £47.75k £56.68k £84.07k £69.04k £75.78k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A