THE POLDEN HILL GWILLIAM CHARITY FOR ANIMAL CARE

Charity number: 1126746
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 04 May 2020 94 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 14 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 18 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 25 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required