WATCHTREE NATURE RESERVE LIMITED

Charity number: 1127029
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 11 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 19 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 19 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 08 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 08 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 25 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 25 August 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 05 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 05 September 2016 On time Download