HILLSBOROUGH ARENA SPORTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1126206
Charity reporting is up to date (52 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £136.90k £115.50k £81.50k £115.06k £116.40k
Total expenditure £122.44k £94.51k £115.04k £125.39k £112.85k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A