THE ELMHURST FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1126479
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £259.90k £258.07k £6.75k £100.00k £0
Total expenditure £74.60k £3.26m £836.88k £102.11k £2.40k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A