THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD - EAGLES CHRISTIAN CONNECTIONS

Charity number: 1126614
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £70.94k £51.04k £55.15k £62.28k £57.87k
Total expenditure £75.67k £70.96k £81.71k £39.22k £26.52k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A