Accounts and annual returns NORTH LONDON COMMUNITY HOUSE

Charity number: 1129542
Charity reporting is overdue by 239 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2022 Overdue Overdue by 239 days
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 Overdue Overdue by 239 days
Annual return 30 November 2021 23 December 2022 84 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 23 December 2022 84 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2020 22 January 2022 114 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 22 January 2022 114 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2019 01 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 28 October 2020 28 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2018 11 October 2019 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 11 October 2019 11 days late Download Open in new window