Financial history NORTH LONDON COMMUNITY HOUSE

Charity number: 1129542
Charity reporting is overdue by 263 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021
Total gross income £98.54k £130.45k £145.92k £98.52k £122.23k
Total expenditure £101.05k £131.14k £147.36k £98.79k £102.63k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £4.00k £10.00k