POSITIVE START (ROSSENDALE) LIMITED

Charity number: 1126416
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 01 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 17 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 24 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 23 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 07 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required