Accounts and annual returns THAMES WATER TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1126714
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 20 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 13 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 28 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

22 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 22 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 30 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window