MOXAFRICA

Charity number: 1128408
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £18.74k £11.70k £21.89k £18.17k £16.97k
Total expenditure £20.84k £17.13k £24.44k £20.76k £8.43k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A