DAGENHAM ISLAMIC WELFARE ASSOCIATION & MOSQUE

Charity number: 1129870
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 01 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

01 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 12 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 12 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 09 September 2019 101 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 09 September 2019 101 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 28 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 28 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 29 June 2017 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 04 November 2016 On time Download