KIELDER WATER AND FOREST PARK DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity number: 1139328
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MICHAEL PRATT Trustee 14 March 2018
VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS' NETWORK NORTH EAST Received: On time
PETER COLLIER STANDFIELD Trustee 01 August 2018 None on record
KEVIN MAY Trustee 19 September 2016 None on record
Mark Holroyd Trustee 22 September 2020 None on record
Catherine Robson Homer Trustee 09 June 2021 None on record
PETER JOHN VINCENT COCKERILL Trustee
THE HEXTOL FOUNDATION Received: On time
Catherine Jane Johns Trustee 11 September 2019 None on record
MR TONY GATES Trustee 07 September 2016 None on record
Julian Francis Tarret Morrison-Bell Trustee 16 September 2020 None on record
HEIDI MOTTRAM CBE Chair
THE ROYAL ANNIVERSARY TRUST Received: On time
WATERAID Received: On time
CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL GREEN Trustee None on record
David Hall Trustee
ACTIVE NORTHUMBERLAND Received: On time
Ian Jackson Trustee 14 March 2018
NORTHUMBERLAND WILDLIFE TRUST LIMITED Received: On time
NORTHUMBERLAND NATIONAL PARK FOUNDATION Received: On time
Mr Ian Hutchinson Trustee 24 May 2017
HALTWHISTLE PARTNERSHIP LTD Received: 40 days late