Trustees ARTS GATEWAY MK

Charity number: 1126872
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN BEST Chair
None on record
Palmira Teresa Do Carmo Almeida M De Sousa Matoso Trustee 27 November 2023
None on record
Faraz Hameed Trustee 25 September 2023
None on record
Jessica Willis Trustee 25 September 2023
None on record
Maxine Thomas-Asante Trustee 28 November 2022
None on record
Andrew Shaw Trustee 24 January 2022
None on record
Joan Margaret Stewart Trustee 26 February 2015
None on record
Darren Stuart Millis Trustee 05 August 2014
None on record