CAFE JERICHO LIMITED

Charity number: 1131250
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 21 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 19 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 09 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 09 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 02 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 02 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 28 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 28 August 2017 On time Download