Trustees SOMERSET AND AVON RAPE AND SEXUAL ABUSE SUPPORT

Charity number: 1126682
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Penny Walster Chair 02 November 2017
None on record
Rani Fernandez Trustee 21 January 2022
None on record
Rachel Notley Trustee 02 December 2021
WE HEAR YOU
Received: On time
Sian Blackham Trustee 02 December 2021
None on record
Charlotte Chappell Trustee 02 December 2021
None on record
Amber Kibby Trustee 02 December 2021
None on record
Rachel Johnson Trustee 10 September 2020
None on record
Catherine Graham Trustee 07 June 2018
None on record
Caroline Green Trustee 02 November 2017
None on record