ROOTED IN

Charity number: 1126786
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £194.10k £256.48k £143.04k £80.93k £118.27k
Total expenditure £196.06k £197.64k £203.15k £100.88k £114.38k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £900 N/A