Financial history AL-HAFEEZ WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1128428
Charity reporting is overdue by 510 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.30k £825 £400 £1.26k £714
Total expenditure £1.54k £2.95k £200 £780 £400
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A