Accounts and annual returns ACTIVE BLIND LEISURE ENTERPRISES A.B.L.E

Charity number: 1129766
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 10 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 16 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 04 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 06 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required