Financial history ACTIVE BLIND LEISURE ENTERPRISES A.B.L.E

Charity number: 1129766
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £6.65k £3.12k £3.46k £2 £1.65k
Total expenditure £7.38k £4.35k £4.31k £333 £2.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A