Financial history SOUTHWATER RESPONDERS

Charity number: 1127511
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022
Total gross income £5.99k £7.82k £12.41k £4.18k £3.85k
Total expenditure £1.05k £6.85k £8.85k £614 £2.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A