SOUTH HAMPSTEAD AND KILBURN COMMUNITY PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1128207
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 19 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 19 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 02 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 27 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 15 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 11 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 05 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 20 December 2016 On time Download