Financial history THE STATHAM FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1127476
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £51.85k £42.42k £7.99k £2.85k £45.54k
Total expenditure £62.58k £33.38k £11.11k £6.55k £48.90k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A