Accounts and annual returns FIR TREE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1127484
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 04 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 16 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 22 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 09 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 09 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 29 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

29 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window