Financial history FIR TREE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1127484
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £42.77k £48.40k £21.73k £42.43k £23.01k
Total expenditure £43.99k £39.08k £36.42k £29.85k £24.86k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.50k N/A N/A £5.00k £9.99k