Financial history ACORN HUNGARY TRUST

Charity number: 1127958
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £65.44k £75.09k £66.50k £60.86k £65.01k
Total expenditure £66.19k £75.00k £78.35k £70.05k £89.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A