Financial history BALUJI MUSIC FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1130985
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £51.34k £83.45k £42.00k £48.77k £68.52k
Total expenditure £46.45k £89.10k £27.46k £48.56k £63.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £23.00k N/A N/A £27.00k £44.79k