Financial history BROOKS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1127951
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 05/04/2022
Total gross income £222.95k £238.82k £88.32k £6.99k £1.14k
Total expenditure £261.19k £190.43k £128.27k £62.16k £38.02k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A