BECONTREE HEATH ISLAMIC SOCIETY (DAGENHAM CENTRAL MOSQUE) LIMITED

Charity number: 1131215
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 November 2020 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 03 November 2020 3 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 05 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 05 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 09 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 09 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 07 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

07 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 15 December 2016 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 14 December 2016 44 days late Download