BECONTREE HEATH ISLAMIC SOCIETY (DAGENHAM CENTRAL MOSQUE) LIMITED

Charity number: 1131215
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £205.72k £74.57k £59.74k £28.29k £49.99k
Total expenditure £121.15k £56.51k £9.36k £26.82k £50.29k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A