THE IRENE NEWMAN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1127940
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 27/10/2015 27/10/2016 27/10/2017 27/10/2018 27/10/2019
Total gross income £17.56k £19.29k £18.54k £18.72k £19.19k
Total expenditure £15.80k £18.91k £18.71k £18.99k £21.49k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A