SHANTHONA WOMEN'S GROUP

Charity number: 1133117
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £17.61k £6.23k £15.80k £21.19k £20.98k
Total expenditure £15.18k £5.93k £15.25k £8.94k £16.35k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A